IL HB2068 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: In provisions concerning the transportation benefits program, removes a provision that allows employees to use pre-tax dollars for the purchase of qualified parking. Provides that the Regional Transportation Authority shall make publicly available a searchable map (rather than database) of addresses that are located within one mile of fixed-route transit service (rather than regularly scheduled transit service). Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
TRANSPORTATION BENEFIT PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0291 |
2023-07-28 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-17 | House | House Concurs |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 077-036-000 |
2023-05-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-008-000 |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-05-11 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-11 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2023-05-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-005-000 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2023 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 015-001-000 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Transportation |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-05-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled |
2023-05-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-039-000 |
2023-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-05-03 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-11 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-04-11 | House | Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-23 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-23 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-03-23 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-010-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |