IL HB2073 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Park District Code. Provides that a park district may lease real estate that the board deems is not required for park or recreational purposes to any individual or entity as long as the lease does not exceed 4 and one-half times (rather than 2 and one-half times) the term of years under specified provisions governing installment purchase contracts. Effective immediately.
Title
PARK DISTRICTS-PROPERTY LEASES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0243 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1205 | 10-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |