IL HB2078 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Historic Preservation Tax Credit Act. Provides for an income tax credit in an amount equal to 25% of qualified expenditures incurred by a qualified taxpayer for the restoration and preservation of a qualified historic structure. Provides that the credit may be carried forward for up to 10 years. Provides that the credit may be sold, assigned, conveyed, or transferred. Provides that the cumulative amount of credits awarded under the Act may not exceed $25,000,000 per year per county. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
HISTORIC PRESERVATION CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2078&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB2078.htm |