IL HB2087 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a school district's decision to allow a student to take a portion of a driver education course through a distance learning program must be determined on a case-by-case basis and must be approved by the student's driver education teacher and the student's parent or guardian; defines "distance learning program". Provides that under no circumstances may the student take the entire driver education course through a distance learning program. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-VIRTUAL DRIVER ED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0183 |
2019-08-02 | House | Effective Date August 2, 2019 |
2019-08-02 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-24.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-24.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |