IL HB2265 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that every public elementary school shall include in its 6th, 7th, or 8th grade curriculum, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, at least one semester of civics education; specifies course content requirements and requires the education to be in accordance with Illinois Learning Standards for social science. Allows school districts to consult with civics education stakeholders, as deemed appropriate by the State Board of Education. Allows school districts to utilize private funding available for the purposes of offering civics education. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
SCH CD-CIVICS COURSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0254 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-014-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-003-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-031-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |