IL HB2287 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that all school buses that are newly purchased, leased, or contracted after January 1, 2028, shall be an electric vehicle. Provides that all school buses that provide transportation for enrolled students operating primarily within an equity investment eligible community or primarily serving students living in an equity investment eligible community after January 1, 2030, shall be an electric vehicle. Provides that all school buses that provide transportation for enrolled students in the State after January 1, 2035, shall be an electric vehicle. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-ELECTRIC SCHOOL BUSES
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Daniel Didech [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-20 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-05-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |