IL HB2291 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $10,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for grants distributed under the Access to Justice Grant Program to the Westside Justice Center and the Resurrection Project. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
$GRANTS-DHS-ACCESS TO JUSTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | To Violence Reduction & Prevention Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2291&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB2291.pdf |