IL HB2306 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that minors shall be brought before a judicial officer within 40 hours, which includes Saturdays, Sundays, and court-designated holidays (rather than within 40 hours exclusive of Saturdays, Sundays, and court-designated holidays. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-DETENTION/SHLTR HEARING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-407Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-410Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-415Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback