IL HB2417 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person who violates a provision in the Code governing the operation of a vehicle approaching a stationary emergency vehicle commits a petty (rather than business) offense punishable by a fine of not more than $75 (rather than a fine of not less than $100 or more than $10,000). Provides that a person who violates the provision and the violation results in damage to the property of another person commits a business offense punishable by a fine of not less than $100 and not more than $10,000. Provides that a person who violates the provision and the violation results in the injury or death of another person commits a Class A misdemeanor.
Title
VEH CD-EMERGENCY VEH-PENALTY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-907 | Amended Code | Citation Text |