IL HB2421 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Natural Resources (Conservation) Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall share the results of pathogen testing of ticks from State parks with the Department of Natural Resources annually. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall thereafter obtain, install, and maintain signs at all State-managed parks and outdoor recreation areas and facilities, including, but not limited to, recreational trail entryways, campgrounds, and any other location as defined and determined by the Department of Natural Resources as necessary and reflective of the results of the Department of Public Health's tick surveillance and pathogen testing, warning individuals that ticks may be found in the area and cause Lyme disease or other tick-borne diseases. The Department of Natural Resources may use models already in use throughout the State or in another state or any model the Department of Natural Resources determines appropriate when determining the design and content for such signage. Effective immediately.
Title
TICK-BORNE DISEASE WARNING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2421&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2421.htm |