IL HB2424 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides that, while a stray dog or cat is being held for the period specified in local ordinance, an animal shelter may release the stray dog or cat to a facility operated by a rescue group for the purpose of providing medical care if the animal shelter is unable to provide that care.
Title
ANIMAL SHELTER-MEDICAL CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 605 | 3.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2424&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2424.htm |