IL HB2487 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Seed Law. Defines "seed library". Provides that seed libraries are exempt from all licensing, testing, labeling, and other requirements of the Illinois Seed Law. Effective immediately.
Title
AGRICULTURE-SEED LIBRARIES
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Rep. Raymond Poe [R] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Michael Tryon [R] |
Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
505 | 110 | 13.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
505 | 110 | 2.132a | New Code | See Bill Text |