IL HB2520 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to annually review and update the underlying data for, and use of, indicators used to determine whether a community is designated as an environmental justice community and to establish a process by which communities not designated as environmental justice communities may petition for such a designation. Provides that an applicant for a permit for the construction of a new source that will become a major source subject to the Clean Air Act Permit Program to be located in an environmental justice community or a new source that has or will require a federally enforceable State operating permit and that will be located in an environmental justice community must conduct a public meeting prior to submission of the permit application and must submit with the permit application an environmental justice assessment identifying the potential environmental and health impacts to the area associated with the proposed project. Provides requirements for the environmental justice assessment. Provides that a supplemental fee of $100,000 for each construction permit application shall be assessed if the construction permit application is subject to the requirements regarding the construction of a new source located in an environmental justice community. Contains provisions regarding public participation requirements for permitting transactions in an environmental justice community. Provides that, if the Agency grants a permit to construct, modify, or operate a facility that emits air pollutants and is classified as a minor source, a third party may petition the Pollution Control Board for a hearing to contest the issuance of the permit. Contains provisions regarding environmental justice grievances. Defines terms. Contains other provisions.
Title
EPA-ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - House - Motion in House (Y: 57 N: 48 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-05-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 057-048-000 |
2023-05-17 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2023-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-05-17 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 017-009-000 |
2023-05-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2023-05-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2023-04-18 | House | Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2023-04-18 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2023-03-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2023-03-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-03-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-03-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-010-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 3.178 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.186 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.187 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.188 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.189 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.281 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 34.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 39.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 39.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 39.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 40.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 9.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |