IL HB2524 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an addition modification in an amount equal to any tuition waiver, grant, or scholarship awarded by the public university to the taxpayer, or to the taxpayer's child, spouse, parent, or other family member, on the basis of the taxpayer's employment with the university if (i) the waiver, grant, or scholarship is used by the recipient in that taxable year and (ii) those amounts are not otherwise included in the taxpayer's adjusted gross income. Provides that 100% of the revenue realized from that addition modification shall be deposited into the Monetary Award Program Reserve Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-TUITION WAIVERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2524&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2524.htm |