IL HB2531 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-31 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-31 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Jobs Creation Finance Act. Provides that municipalities may designate job creation areas. Provides that businesses that undertake job creation projects in those designated areas are eligible for certain tax incentives. Provides that municipalities may issue bonds in connection with those projects. Contains provisions concerning public hearings. Contains numerous other provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
JOB CREATION-FINANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-08-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2531&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2531.htm |