IL HB2557 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Real Economic Support That Acknowledges Unique Restaurant Assistance Needed To Survive (RESTAURANTS) Act. Creates the Illinois Restaurant Revitalization Fund. Provides that the State Treasurer and certain units of local government shall award grants from the Fund to eligible entities. Provides that the term "eligible entity" means a restaurant, food stand, food truck, food cart, caterer, saloon, inn, tavern, bar, lounge, or other similar place of business, subject to certain limitations. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act and the State Finance Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ILLINOIS RESTAURANTS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2557&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2557.htm |