IL HB2571 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0063
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that "foster family home" means a facility for child care in residences of families who receive no more than 6 (rather than 8) children unrelated to them, unless all the children are of common parentage, or residences of relatives who receive no more than 6 related children placed by the Department of Children and Family Services, unless the children are of common parentage, for the purpose of providing family care and training for the children on a full-time basis, except the Director of Children and Family Services, pursuant to Department regulations, may waive the numerical limitation of foster children who may be cared for in a foster family home for any of the following reasons to allow: (1) a parenting youth in foster care to remain with the child of the parenting youth; (2) siblings to remain together; (3) a child with an established meaningful relationship with the family to remain with the family; or (4) a family with special training or skills to provide care to a child who has a severe disability. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that within 35 days after placing a child in its care in a qualified residential treatment program, as defined by the federal Social Security Act, the Department shall file a written report with the court and send copies of the report to all parties. Provides that within 20 days of the filing of the report, the court shall hold a hearing to consider the Department's report and determine whether placement of the child in a qualified residential treatment program provides the most effective and appropriate level of care for the child in the least restrictive environment and if the placement is consistent with the short-term and long-term goals for the child, as specified in the permanency plan for the child. Makes other changes. Effective October 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RESIDENTIAL TREATMENT-MINORS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0063
2019-07-12HouseEffective Date July 12, 2019
2019-07-12HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 012-000-000
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225102.17Amended CodeCitation Text
7054052-28Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback