IL HB2649 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the rate of tax under the Non-Home Rule Municipal Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Non-Home Rule Municipal Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Non-Home Rule Municipal Use Tax Act may not exceed 2% (currently, 1%). Provides that the rate of tax that may be imposed for municipal operations may not exceed 1%. With respect to the Non-Home Rule Municipal Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Non-Home Rule Municipal Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Non-Home Rule Municipal Use Tax Act, provides that the term "public infrastructure" includes the acquisition, repair, and maintenance of public safety equipment. Effective immediately.
Title
NON-HOME RULE-ROT-RATE
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Ronald Sandack [R] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] |
Rep. Al Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-04-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-04-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2649&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2649.htm |