IL HB2675 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0441
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0441
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code and the Critical Health Problems and Comprehensive Health Education Act. Makes changes to provide that each class or course in comprehensive sex education offered in any of grades 6 through 12 shall include instruction on both abstinence and contraception for the prevention of pregnancy and sexually transmitted diseases, including HIV/AIDS. Makes changes to provide that all classes that teach sex education and discuss sexual intercourse in grades 6 through 12 shall emphasize that abstinence from sexual intercourse is a responsible and positive decision and is the only protection that is 100% effective against unwanted teenage pregnancy, sexually transmitted diseases, and acquired immune deficiency syndrome (AIDS) when transmitted sexually. Makes changes to provide that all classes that teach sex education and discuss sexual intercourse in grades 6 through 12 shall satisfy specified criteria. Provides that an opportunity shall be afforded to individuals (not just parents or guardians) to examine the instructional materials to be used in the class or course. Provides that the State Board of Education shall make available resource materials. Provides that school districts that do not currently provide sex education are not required to teach sex education. Provides that if a sex education class or course is offered in any of grades 6 through 12, the school district may choose and adapt the developmentally and age-appropriate, medically accurate, evidence-based, and complete sex education curriculum that meets the specific needs of its community. Provides that the Comprehensive Health Education Program shall include the educational area of evidence-based and medically accurate information regarding sexual abstinence (instead of the area of sexual abstinence until marriage).
Title
SCH CD-HEALTH ED-SEX ED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0441 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-021-000 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2013 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-005-000 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-052-000 |
2013-04-17 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2013-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-006-000 |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 110 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |