IL HB2675 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Establishes a distiller pub license. Provides that a distiller pub license shall allow the licensee to only (i) manufacture up to 5,000 gallons of spirits per year only on the premises specified in the license, (ii) make sales of the spirits manufactured on the premises, (iii) store the spirits upon the premises, (iv) sell and offer for sale at retail from the licensed premises for off-premises consumption no more than 5,000 gallons per year so long as such sales are only made in-person, (v) sell and offer for sale at retail for use and consumption on the premises specified in the license any form of alcoholic liquor purchased from a licensed distributor or importing distributor, and (vi) with the prior approval of the Illinois Liquor Control Commission, annually transfer no more than 5,000 gallons of spirits manufactured on the premises to a licensed distiller pub wholly owned and operated by the same licensee. Prohibits a distiller pub licensee from selling spirits manufactured by the licensee to retail licensees. Establishes fees for a distiller pub license. Provides that a craft distiller licensee may simultaneously hold a distiller pub license if certain requirements are met. Authorizes a craft distiller to transfer spirits to a wholly owned distiller pub if specified requirements are met. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-DISTILLER PUBS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-000-000
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-22HouseArrived in House
2019-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-04-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-002-000
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-04-10HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 012-000-000
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
2019-03-28HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2019-03-28HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2019-03-28HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-06HouseTo Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23553-12Amended CodeCitation Text
23555-1Amended CodeCitation Text
23555-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2675&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2675.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2675eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2675enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2675ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2675ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2675ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2675sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2675_04112019_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB2675_05222019_028000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2675sam001_05292019_046000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback