IL HB2691 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice to claim that another has infringed upon a copyright if the claim falsely threatens adverse administrative or judicial action, the assertions lack a reasonable basis in fact or law, the person making the assertion is not, or does not represent, a person with a current right to license the copyright, or the claim fails to make certain other disclosures. Provides that a person who sends certain written communications bears liability or owes compensation to another person if: (1) the communication falsely states that litigation has been filed against the intended recipient; or (2) the assertions contained in the communication lack a reasonable basis in fact or law because the communication seeks compensation for a copyright that has been held invalid or unenforceable in a final, unappealable or unappealed, judicial or administrative decision. Provides that nothing in the provisions shall be construed to deem it an unlawful practice for any person who owns or has the right to license or enforce a copyright to: (1) advise others of that ownership or right of license or enforcement; (2) communicate to others that the copyright is available for license or sale; (3) notify another of the infringement of the copyright; or (4) seek compensation on account of past or present infringement or for a license to the copyright.
Title
CONS FRAUD COPYRIGHT DEMAND
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2SSS | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2691&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2691.htm |