IL HB2941 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that no former officer and no employee or immediate family member of a former officer shall, for a period of 2 years after the end of the former officer's most recent term of office, engage in lobbying. Provides that no immediate family member of an officer shall, during the term of office to which the officer is elected, engage in lobbying. Makes a violation of these requirements a Class 4 felony. Authorizes the imposition of a fine in an amount equal to the total amount of salary, compensation, or any other form of payment that the person received in connection with the prohibited activity. Defines "immediate family member". Effective immediately.
Title
ETHICS ACT-LOBBY RESTRICTIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Drury [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 50-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |