IL HB3018 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0495
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Food Handling Regulation Enforcement Act. Provides that a restaurant must prominently display signage indicating to guests and employees that any information regarding food allergies must be communicated to the restaurant's food service sanitation manager. Provides that the food service manager shall be responsible for displaying the signage. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOOD HANDLING-SIGNAGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0495
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date August 23, 2019
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-001
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-02HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-000-000
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2019-02-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4106253.08New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback