IL HB3053 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Finance Authority Act. Creates a school bus revolving loan program. Provides for a 2% rate of interest on loans for the purchase of a school bus if the chassis and the passenger compartment are built outside of Illinois, a 1% rate of interest for a school bus if either the chassis or the passenger compartment is built in Illinois, or a 0% rate of interest for a school bus if both the chassis and the passenger compartment are built in Illinois. Creates the School Bus Revolving Loan Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that loan funds shall be paid out of the Fund, and repayments of loans shall be deposited into the Fund. Provides that a loan to a school district or unit of local government for the purchase of school buses may not exceed $100,000. Provides that the repayment period may not exceed 20 years. Effective immediately.
Title
IFA-SCHOOL BUS REVOLVING LOAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3501 | 825-87 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.786 | New Code | See Bill Text |