IL HB3075 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Vision and Hearing Test Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health, in consultation with the State Board of Education, shall establish an auditory-visual integration assessment pilot program in selected school districts in the northern region of the State, to be determined by the State Board of Education. Sets forth provisions concerning the pilot program. Effective immediately.
Title
CHLD VISION-HEARING-PILOT PRGM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2013 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-04-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000 |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-03-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |