IL HB3101 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-7)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0499
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-7)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0499
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Lodging Establishment Human Trafficking Recognition Training Act. Requires hotels and motels to train employees in the recognition of human trafficking and protocols for reporting observed human trafficking to the appropriate authority. Provides that the Department of Labor shall develop the curriculum for the training. Requires the training program to be developed by January 1, 2020 and training by hotels and motels to begin by June 1, 2020. Effective immediately.
Title
HUMAN TRAFFICKING TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0499 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 021-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-001 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-03-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |