IL HB3113 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0500
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that no individual or group policy of accident and health insurance shall require a patient to make a co-payment or a deductible for a dermatology examination. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NO COPAY-DERMATOLOGY EXAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0500
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 114-001-000
2019-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-001-000
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 019-000-000
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 019-000-000
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3
2019-05-22HouseArrived in House
2019-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Fine
2019-05-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 017-000-000
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2019
2019-05-20SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Insurance
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2019-05-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 018-000-000
2019-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - Insurance
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Insurance
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-04-04HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-022-000
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-03-26HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 021-000-000
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Insurance Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.33New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3113&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3113.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3113eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3113enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0500.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3113ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3113sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3113sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3113sam003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3113_04042019_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB3113_05222019_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3113sam003_05302019_052001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3113sam001_05302019_052000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback