IL HB3122 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that, on or before July 1, 2024, the Department of Transportation shall create and implement a Type II Noise Suppression Program to provide noise abatement on existing highways in the State. Provides that, by July 1, 2024, the Department shall provide notice to the General Assembly that the Noise Suppression system has been activated. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
HIGHWAY NOISE SUPPRESSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3122&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3122.htm |