IL HB3143 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that every driver shall report to the Secretary of State any medical condition that is likely to cause loss of consciousness, seizures, or any loss of ability to safely operate a motor vehicle within 10 days of the driver becoming aware of the condition. Includes seizures within the standard of physical disorders characterized by momentary or prolonged lapses of consciousness or control which constitute a limitation to a person's ability to operate a motor vehicle or causes the person to be a driving hazard. Provides that a person commits reckless driving when he or she knowingly drives a vehicle when that person has, within the preceding 36 months, experienced a loss of consciousness or a seizure that would interfere with the ability to safely operate a vehicle. Provides that a person does not commit reckless driving if he or she has been treated by a physician for the loss of consciousness or seizure, and that physician has advised the person that he or she may operate a vehicle. Effective January 1, 2016.
Title
VEH CD-SEIZURES WHILE DRIVING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2015 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-29 | House | House Non-Concurs |
2015-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Syverson |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-001-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-034-000 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-116.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-903 | Amended Code | Citation Text |