IL HB3170 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2028 (rather than January 1, 2024). Makes a conforming change in the Clerks of Courts Act. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that any person (rather than only any minor) adjudicated delinquent for an offense which if committed by an adult would constitute a violation of (i) the Cannabis Control Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act, or the Steroid Control Act shall be required to pay a criminal laboratory analysis assessment of $100 for each adjudication or (ii) a provision regarding driving while under the influence of the Illinois Vehicle Code shall pay a crime laboratory DUI analysis assessment of $150 for each adjudication. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM&TRAF ASSESS-REPEAL EXTEND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 105 | 27.1b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 135 | 15-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 135 | 20-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-9-1.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-9-1.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3170&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3170.htm |