IL HB3217 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Asian American Family Commission Act. Creates the Asian American Family Commission. Provides for the appointment of members to the Commission and terms of membership. Provides that members shall serve without compensation, but shall be reimbursed for Commission-related expenses. Provides for the appointment of liaisons from specified State agencies to serve as ex officio members of the Commission. Provides that the Office of the Governor, in cooperation with the State agencies appointing liaisons to the Commission, shall provide administrative support to the Commission. Provides for funding to the Commission. Requires the Commission to annually report to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
ASIAN AMERICAN FAMILY COMM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0392 |
2019-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-001 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-001 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |