IL HB3245 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a dealer or manufacturer shall not sell any new passenger vehicle that is equipped with any partial driving automation feature without giving notice of the functions and limitation of the features to the buyer or owner. Provides that a manufacturer or dealer shall not use language in its marketing material that implies that a partial driving automation feature is fully autonomous or otherwise has functionality not actually included in the feature. Provides that compliance with the provisions shall not limit the civil liability for claims arising out of negligence or product defect. Requires a manufacturer to provide information to enable the dealer to comply with the buyer's notice. Provides that a violation of the provisions shall be a business offense.
Title
VEH CD-PART AUTO FEAT NOTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3245&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3245.htm |