IL HB3249 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Opioid Settlement Fund as a special fund in the State Treasury to receive opioid-related settlement funds to which the State of Illinois may be entitled under any opioid-related settlement. Provides that all funds received by the State from an opioid-related settlement shall be deposited into the Opioid Settlement Fund to be used for purposes related to alleviating the opioid crisis. Further specifies the use of moneys in the Fund. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-OPIOID SETTLEMENT FUND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-19 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-124 | New Code | See Bill Text |