IL HB3252 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Income Withholding for Support Act. Deletes provision stating that for withholding of income, the payor is entitled to receive a fee not to exceed $5 per month to be taken from the obligor's income.
Title
INCOME WITHHOLDING-PAYOR FEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2011-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor Committee; 016-002-000 |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Labor Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 28 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |