IL HB3390 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides that a kennel operator shall install in the kennel a fire alarm monitoring system that triggers notification to local emergency responders when activated. Provides that the Department of Agriculture shall deny the initial licensure or license renewal of a kennel operator for the failure to comply with this provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

KENNEL OPERATION-FIRE ALARMS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-016-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-21HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Diane Pappas

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256053.9New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback