IL HB3414 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Biometric Information Privacy Act. Deletes language allowing a prevailing party in an action to recover for each violation of the Act. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to apply to a licensed operator of a facility collecting, storing, or transmitting biometric information. Provides that all claims filed under the Act shall be filed within one year of the initial violation. Provides that continuing violations of the Act, or violations of separate provisions of the Act, shall be considered the same occurrence and are subject to the one-year statute of limitations calculated from the date of the initial violation. Provides that an employee may waive any violation under the Act after an explanation of rights. Contains applicability and severability provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
BIPA-REMEDIES-CONSTRUCTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 14 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 14 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 14 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3414&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3414.htm |