IL HB3427 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Water Heater Safety Valve Act. Provides that a manufacturer or supplier of a hot water heater for use in a residential home or facility must supply or attach a temperature mixing valve or other safety valve to the hot water heater or tank that prevents water with a temperature above 130 degrees Fahrenheit from coming from any faucet or other source of water into direct contact with a person. Amends the Illinois Plumbing License Law to provide that a person engaged in plumbing who installs a hot water heater for use in a residential home or facility must supply or attach a temperature mixing valve or other safety valve to the hot water heater or tank that prevents water with a temperature above 130 degrees Fahrenheit from coming from any bathtub faucet, shower faucet, sink faucet, or any other source of water into direct contact with a person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WATER HEATER SAFETY VALVE ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2019
2019-05-20SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Public Health; 010-000-000
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-04-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-10HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-02-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-02-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback