IL HB3435 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compulsory Attendance Article of the School Code. Allows a child to be absent from school on a particular day or days or at a particular time of day for the reason that his or her parent or legal guardian is an active duty member of the uniformed services and has been called to duty for, is on leave from, or has immediately returned from deployment to a combat zone or combat-support postings. Provides that such a student shall be granted 10 days of excused absences in any school year and, at the discretion of the school board, additional excused absences to visit the student's parent or legal guardian relative to such leave or deployment of the parent or legal guardian. Requires the student and parent or legal guardian to obtain assignments from the student's teacher prior to any period of excused absence and for ensuring that such assignments are completed by the student prior to his or her return to school from such period of excused absence. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-EXCUSED ABSENCE-MILITAR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 26-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3435&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3435.htm |