IL HB3480 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that certain interviews of a child who is alleged to be an abused child may not be conducted unless the interview is videotaped and audiotaped by the Department of Children and Family Services. Requires that the Department preserve those videotapes and audiotapes and other materials until all judgments in legal proceedings relating to the victim-sensitive interview are final and all direct and habeas corpus appeals are exhausted or such legal proceedings are barred by law. Provides for access to copies of the preserved materials by a party to a proceeding relating to the materials. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-CHILD ABUSE-INTERVIEW
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-01 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 7.5a | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3480&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3480.htm |