IL HB3480 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes various changes concerning sales in error. In provisions allowing a sale in error if the assessor, chief county assessment officer, board of review, board of appeals, or other county official has made an error, provides that the error must be material to the tax sale at issue and may not be an error in the description of the physical characteristics, location, or picture of the property. Removes provisions allowing a sale in error when a bankruptcy petition has been filed after the tax sale and before the issuance of the tax deed. Provides that, if the bankruptcy petition is filed prior to the tax sale, then a sale in error is allowed if the property is subject to an automatic stay and the stay is active on the date of the date of that sale. Provides that the $100 fee paid by a tax purchaser for a certificate of purchase is non-refundable. Provides that the notice of the expiration of the period of redemption shall be delivered to the sheriff (or to the coroner or private detective, as applicable) for service not less than 5 months prior to the expiration of the period of redemption. Makes other changes
Title
PROP TX-SALE IN ERROR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-330 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3480&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3480.htm |