IL HB3503 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Provides that an insurer shall offer, for an additional premium and subject to the insurer's standard of insurability, optional coverage or optional reimbursement for hearing instruments and related services for all individuals (rather than the requiring the insurer to provide coverage for hearing instruments and related services for all individuals 65 years of age or older) when a hearing care professional prescribes a hearing instrument to augment communication. Provides a maximum of $2,500 (rather $1,500) for the hearing instrument and related services every 24 months. Provides that nothing in the provisions precludes an insured from selecting a more expensive hearing instrument as his or her own expense. Removes language providing that an insurer shall not be required to pay a claim filed by its insured for the payment of the cost of a hearing instrument if less than 24 months before the date of the claim its insured filed a claim for payment of the cost of the hearing instrument and the claim was paid by the insurer. Removes provisions amending the Illinois Public Aid Code.
Title
INS CODE-HEARING AIDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0393 |
2019-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-002-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 017-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 018-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 021-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.30a | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |