IL HB3606 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Re-assigned to Executive
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Re-assigned to Executive
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Changes reference to "penalty" to "damages" in provision concerning the Council's enforcement procedures and a provision concerning remedies or sanctions for vendors failing to make good faith efforts to meet contract goals. Makes other technical changes.
Title
BEP-GOOD FAITH EFFORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-035-000 |
2023-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2023-03-23 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 005-003-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 575 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 575 | 3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 575 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 575 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 575 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |