IL HB3607 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. With respect to vacancies in the office of United States Senator from Illinois, provides that: (i) a vacancy occurring more than 180 days before the next regularly scheduled election to fill that seat shall remain vacant until filled at a special election; and (ii) a vacancy occurring 180 or fewer days before the next regularly scheduled election to fill that seat shall be filled by temporary appointment by the Governor until the conclusion of the vacant term (now, whenever a vacancy occurs it is filled by temporary appointment by the Governor until the next election of United States Representatives).
Title
U.S. SENATE SPECIAL ELECTION
Sponsors
Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] | Rep. Renee Kosel [R] | Rep. David Harris [R] |
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2011-02-24 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 25-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 2A-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 2A-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3607&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3607.htm |