IL HB3610 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-23 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-23 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Replaces provisions concerning medical assistance payments for ambulance services. Provides for payment for ground ambulance services under the medical assistance program. Provides that for ground ambulance services provided to a medical assistance recipient on or after July 1, 2009, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall provide payment to ground ambulance services providers for base charges and mileage charges based upon the lesser of the provider's charge, as reflected on the provider's claim form, or the Illinois Medicaid Ambulance Fee Schedule rates. Provides for establishment of the Illinois Medicaid Ambulance Fee Schedule, and provides for a 2-year phase-in of that Schedule. Provides that effective for dates of service on or after July 1, 2010, the Department shall update the Illinois Medicaid Ambulance Fee Schedule rates to be in compliance with the Medicare Ambulance Fee Schedule rates for ground ambulance services in effect at the time of the update. Makes other changes in connection with medical assistance payments for ground ambulance services. Effective immediately.
Title
HFS-MEDICAID-AMBULANCE SERVICE
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Biggins [R] | Rep. Mike Bost [R] | Rep. John Bradley [D] | Rep. Thomas Holbrook [D] |
Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Dan Reitz [D] | Rep. Michael Smith [D] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-23 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3610&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB3610.htm |