IL HB3612 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the High Speed Railway Commission Act. Prescribes the membership of the Commission. Provides that the Commission shall create a statewide plan for a high-speed rail line and feeder network connecting St. Louis, Missouri and Chicago, Illinois that includes current existing Amtrak and Metra services, connects the cities of Rockford, Moline, Peoria, and Decatur, and uses inter-city bus service to coordinate with the rail line. Provides that the Commission shall conduct a ridership study and shall make findings and recommendations concerning a governance structure, the frequency of service, and implementation of the plan. Provides that the Commission shall report to the General Assembly and the Government no later than December 31 of each year. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall provide administrative support to the Commission. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2025. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGH SPEED RAILWAY COMMISSION
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Rep. Mark Walker [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Capital Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Capital Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |