IL HB3624 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Authorizes the Environmental Protection Agency to disburse grants from the Illinois Clean Water Fund to other State agencies, local governments, publicly owned entities subject to NPDES permitting requirements, and charitable organizations for the purposes of reducing water pollution and protecting surface and ground water quality and aquatic habitats. Authorizes the Agency to adopt rules to administer this grant program. Effective July 1, 2011.
Title
EPA-IL CLEAN WATER FUND
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Sandy Cole [R] | Sen. Chris Nybo [R] |
Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Nybo |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2011-03-03 | House | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee |
2011-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 12.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3624&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3624.htm |