IL HB3639 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0067
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0067
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Teachers' Retirement System for its FY12 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2011.
Title
$TRS-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0067 |
2011-06-30 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2011 |
2011-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-05-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-04-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-004-001 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2011 |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 13, 2011 |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Do Pass Appropriations I; 007-004-000 |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2011-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 019-000-000 |
2011-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross |
2011-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2011-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2011-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2011-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-25 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2011-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |