IL HB3639 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that a video gaming terminal operator may own, manage, or control a licensed establishment or licensed truck stop establishment as long as the video gaming terminal operator does not place video gaming terminals he or she owns, services, and maintains within that licensed establishment or licensed truck stop establishment. Effective immediately.
Title
VIDEO GAMING-TERMINAL OPERATOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-12-03 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2014-11-06 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-06-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-06-19 | House | First Reading |
2013-05-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3639&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3639.htm |