IL HB3648 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0541
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0541
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Higher Education in Prison Act. Provides that on or before September 1 of the year following the effective date of the Act and each subsequent September 1, the Department of Corrections shall release a report, to be published on the Department of Corrections's Internet website, detailing certain information pertaining to higher education within Department institutions and facilities. Requires the report to be filed with the Governor and General Assembly. Provides that the data provided in the report shall include an aggregate chart at the Department level and individual reports by each correctional institution or facility of the Department of Corrections. Provides that on or before September 1 of the year following the effective date of the Act and each subsequent September 1, each college and university that provides academic programs for committed persons shall report to the Board of Higher Education on enrollment, retention, completion, and student demographics, including race, ethnicity, age, and gender of committed students. Provides that the Board of Higher Education shall compile the information and, within 60 days after receipt of such information, issue a report reflecting the information for each institution required to report. Provides that the report must be filed with the Governor and General Assembly and made publicly available on the Board of Higher Education's Internet website.
Title
HIGHER EDUCATION IN PRISON
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0541 |
2023-08-11 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2023-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-19 | House | House Concurs |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Higher Education Committee |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-05-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2023-05-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-003-000 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Pacione-Zayas |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |