IL HB3677 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Uniform Partition of Heirs Property Act. Defines terms. Provides for: applicability; relation to other law; service; notice by posting; commissioners; determination of value; cotenant buyout; partition alternatives; considerations for partition in kind; open-market sale, sealed bids, or auction; and report of open-market sale. Makes conforming changes in the Code of Civil Procedure. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PARTITION OF HEIRS PROPERTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 116-000-000
2019-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000
2019-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2019-05-22HouseArrived in House
2019-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Crowe
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-04-30SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-000-000
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-03-13HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-03-13HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2019-03-13HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-03-07HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-03-07HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-03-06HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
735517-101Amended CodeCitation Text
735517-102Amended CodeCitation Text
735517-105Amended CodeCitation Text
735517-106Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3677&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3677.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3677eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3677enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3677sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3677sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3677_03292019_050000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB3677_05222019_021000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3677sam002_05302019_038001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3677sam001_05302019_038000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback